Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Menditto

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Noto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1794BornCasanova
19 Apr 181823.8Ordained PriestPriest
20 May 184449.9SelectedBishop of Noto, Italy
22 Jul 184450.0ConfirmedBishop of Noto, Italy
28 Jul 184450.1Ordained BishopBishop of Noto, Italy
13 Nov 184955.3ResignedBishop of Noto, Italy
2 Mar 185055.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Noto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Menditto (VIAF: 88600820)
Bishop Giuseppe Menditto (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Noto

  • a priest for 31.8 years
  • a bishop for 5.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 281
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1844, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 29 Nov 2016