Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Agostini

Deceased

Bishop of Nocera Umbra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1807BornFano
17 Dec 183124.5Ordained PriestPriest
14 Apr 184840.9AppointedBishop of Nocera Umbra, Italy
24 Apr 184840.9Ordained BishopBishop of Nocera Umbra, Italy
4 Feb 186153.7DiedBishop of Nocera Umbra, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Agostini:
Bishop Francesco Agostini (born , died ) Bishop of Nocera Umbra

  • a priest for 29.1 years
  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 420

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013