Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michele Navazio

Deceased

Bishop of L’Aquila


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 May 1796BornMelfi
18 Dec 181923.5Ordained PriestPriest
21 Nov 184448.4SelectedBishop of L’Aquila, Italy
20 Jan 184548.6ConfirmedBishop of L’Aquila, Italy
26 Jan 184548.6Ordained BishopBishop of L’Aquila, Italy
26 Apr 185255.9DiedBishop of L’Aquila, Italy

MicroData Summary for Michele Navazio
Bishop Michele Navazio (born , died ) Bishop of L’Aquila

  • a priest for 32.3 years
  • a bishop for 7.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1851
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 84
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1845, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 30 Nov 2016