Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Chiaromanni

Deceased

Bishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1801Born
13 Mar 182423.1Ordained PriestPriest
12 Apr 184746.2AppointedBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy
18 Apr 184746.2Ordained BishopBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy
29 Jul 186968.5DiedBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Chiaromanni (VIAF: 304914497)
Bishop Giuseppe Chiaromanni (born , died ) Bishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBagnoro
Ordained BishopS. Maria della Virgine, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 45.3 years
  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 214
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1847, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast