Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benedetto Falconcini

Deceased

Bishop of Arezzo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1657³BornVolterra
15 Dec 170447.8AppointedBishop of Arezzo, Italy
21 Dec 170447.8Ordained BishopBishop of Arezzo, Italy
6 Mar 172467.0DiedBishop of Arezzo, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Benedetto Falconcini:
Bishop Benedetto Falconcini (born , died ) Bishop of Arezzo

  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 98
  • ob/c2: CB, 23 Sep 2014
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Number 18,244
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1704, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 14 Jun 2015