Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Donnino Donnini

Deceased

Bishop of Arezzo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1832Born
20 Sep 185623.7Ordained PriestPriest
19 Sep 187946.7AppointedBishop of Montalcino, Italy
28 Sep 187946.8Ordained BishopBishop of Montalcino, Italy
14 Dec 189159.0AppointedBishop of Arezzo, Italy
18 Oct 190471.8DiedBishop of Arezzo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Donnino Donnini
Bishop Donnino Donnini (born , died ) Bishop of Arezzo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarga
Ordained BishopS. Jean des Florentins, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 48.0 years
  • a bishop for 25.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: JPG
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 120, and Page 319
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1879, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Mar 2017