Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Angelo Franceschi

Deceased

Archbishop of Pisa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1734BornPisa
24 Sep 175722.9Ordained PriestPriest
13 Nov 177541.0AppointedBishop of Arezzo, Italy
10 Dec 177541.1Ordained BishopBishop of Arezzo, Italy
28 Sep 177843.9AppointedArchbishop of Pisa, Italy
13 Mar 180671.4DiedArchbishop of Pisa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelo Franceschi:
Archbishop Angelo Franceschi (born , died ) Archbishop of Pisa

  • a priest for 48.4 years
  • a bishop for 30.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 99, and Page 339
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1775, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 21 Dec 2015