Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marco Saracini

Deceased

Bishop of Volterra, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Jul 1535²Born
15 Jan 157438.5AppointedBishop of Volterra, Italy
24 Jan 157438.5Ordained BishopBishop of Volterra, Italy
21 Sep 157439.2DiedBishop of Volterra, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marco Saracini
Bishop Marco Saracini (born Jul 1535, died ) Bishop of Volterra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArezzo, Diocese of Arezzo
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceVolterra, Diocese of Volterra
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Volterra, Diocese of Volterra

  • a bishop for .6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 337
  • b/c2+: AT, 2 Oct 2017
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1574, Number 1
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Number 19,549

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast