Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Ottavio Attavanti

Deceased

Bishop of Arezzo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jul 1643Born
22 Mar 166925.6Ordained PriestPriest
24 May 168339.8AppointedBishop of Arezzo, Italy
30 May 168339.8Ordained BishopBishop of Arezzo, Italy
9 Jan 169147.4DiedBishop of Arezzo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Ottavio Attavanti
Bishop Giuseppe Ottavio Attavanti (born , died ) Bishop of Arezzo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLivorno

  • a priest for 21.7 years
  • a bishop for 7.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 98
  • ob/c2: CB, 30 Mar 2013
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,683, Number 11
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast