Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Lambardi

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Nazareth


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1571¹Born
22 Mar 162756.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nazareth
18 Apr 162756.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nazareth
Jul 1636³65.5DiedTitular Archbishop of Nazareth

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Lambardi
Archbishop Antonio Lambardi (born 1571, died Jul 1636) Titular Archbishop of Nazareth

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastiglion Fiorentino, Diocese of Arezzo, Italy
Ordained BishopSant’Andrea della Valle, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceMonteverde, Diocese of Monteverde, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Monteverde, Diocese of Monteverde, Italy

  • a bishop for 9.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 254
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,627, Number 40
  • ob/c2/loc: AT, 24 Jan 2019
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Number 20,066

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast