Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Ricasoli

Deceased

Bishop of Arezzo, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Sep 1355AppointedBishop of Sora, Italy
6 Mar 1357AppointedBishop of Aversa, Italy
19 Jun 1370AppointedBishop of Firenze, Italy
9 Feb 1387AppointedBishop of Faenza, Italy
5 Aug 1391AppointedBishop of Arezzo, Italy
1403²DiedBishop of Arezzo, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Angelo Ricasoli
Bishop Angelo Ricasoli (died 1403) Bishop of Arezzo

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 250, and Page 246
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 104, and Page 123
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 458

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast