Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Ermenegildo Ricci, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Laohokow [Laohekou], China

Titular Bishop of Antipyrgos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1886Born
190316.3ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
29 Jun 191023.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
22 Feb 192235.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Northwestern Hupeh {Hu-Pè Occiduo-Settentrionale}, China
22 Feb 192235.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Antipyrgos
28 May 192235.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Antipyrgos
18 Oct 193044.1ResignedVicar Apostolic of Laohokow [Laohekou], China
26 Nov 193145.2DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Laohokow [Laohekou], China

MicroData Summary for Luigi Ermenegildo Ricci
Bishop Luigi Ermenegildo Ricci O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Laohokow [Laohekou]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontelabreve, Italy

  • a priest for 21.4 years
  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017