Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso Salviati

Deceased

Bishop of Arezzo, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Aug 1634AppointedBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy
10 Sep 1634Ordained BishopBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy
1 Mar 1638AppointedBishop of Arezzo, Italy
15 Oct 1671³DiedBishop of Arezzo, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Salviati
Bishop Tommaso Salviati (died ) Bishop of Arezzo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFlorence

  • a bishop for 37.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 156, and Page 93
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1634, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018