Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Agostino Cardinal Oreggi (Oregius)

Deceased

Archbishop of Benevento

Cardinal-Priest of San Sisto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1577²BornSanta Sofia
28 Nov 163356.9AppointedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
28 Nov 163356.9Elevated to Cardinal
31 Dec 163356.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
9 Jan 163457.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Sisto
12 Jul 163558.5DiedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Agostino Oreggi (Oregius) (VIAF: 9779621)
Agostino Cardinal Oreggi (Oregius) (born 1577, died ) Archbishop of Benevento

  • a bishop for 1.5 years
  • a cardinal for 1.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 28 Nov 1633
  • c2: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 113, and Page 43
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,834
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1633, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 27 Oct 2016