Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Paolo Bucciarelli (Buccerelli)

Deceased

Bishop of Narni, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1593¹Born
22 Mar 163441.2AppointedBishop of Narni, Italy
18 Apr 163441.2Ordained BishopBishop of Narni, Italy
21 Feb 165663.1DiedBishop of Narni, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Paolo Bucciarelli (Buccerelli)
Bishop Giovanni Paolo Bucciarelli (Buccerelli) (born 1593, died ) Bishop of Narni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArquata, Diocese of Ascoli Piceno
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 252
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1634, Number 27
  • ob/c2: AT, 17 Sep 2016
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,007

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast