Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Domenico Marcot (Malcoto detto Foconio), O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Split (Spalato), Croatia


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Aug 1575AppointedTitular Bishop of Corinthus
3 Aug 1577AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Split (Spalato), Croatia
1582¹SucceededArchbishop of Split (Spalato), Croatia
2 Aug 1602DiedArchbishop of Split (Spalato), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Domenico Marcot (Malcoto detto Foconio)
Archbishop Giovanni Domenico Marcot (Malcoto detto Foconio) O.P. (died ) Archbishop of Split (Spalato)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 303, and Page 178
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 320
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,575, Number 17*
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,577, Number 39*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast