Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paweł Piasecki

Deceased

Bishop of Chełm

Bishop of Przemyśl


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1579BornPiaski
20 Dec 162748.2AppointedBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine
16 Jul 162848.7Ordained BishopBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine
27 Nov 164162.1AppointedBishop of Chełm, Poland
28 Nov 164465.1AppointedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
1 Aug 164969.8DiedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland

MicroData Summary for Paweł Piasecki:
Bishop Paweł Piasecki (born , died ) Bishop of Chełm

  • a bishop for 21.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 130, and Page 147
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 192, Number 15,588
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 288

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013