Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Achacy Grochowski

Deceased

Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck)


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Aug 1624AppointedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
6 Oct 1627AppointedBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
7 Jan 1633DiedBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Achacy Grochowski
Bishop Achacy Grochowski (died ) Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 288, and Page 224
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1624, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 23 Jun 2016