Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoni Franciszek Ksawery Sotkiewicz

Deceased

Bishop of Sandomierz, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1826Born
29 Jul 184923.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
5 Aug 184923.5Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 188357.1AppointedBishop of Sandomierz, Poland
20 May 188357.3Ordained BishopBishop of Sandomierz, Poland
4 May 190175.3DiedBishop of Sandomierz, Poland

MicroData Summary for Antoni Franciszek Ksawery Sotkiewicz (VIAF: 302100482)
Bishop Antoni Franciszek Ksawery Sotkiewicz (born , died ) Bishop of Sandomierz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBardo
Ordained BishopSt. Petersbourg

  • a priest for 51.7 years
  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 499
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1883, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Apr 2017