Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henryk Piotr Kossowski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

Titular Bishop of Serra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1828BornVarsavia
13 Mar 185729.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
23 Mar 185729.2Ordained PriestPriest
24 Mar 188456.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
24 Mar 188456.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Serra
13 Jul 188456.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Serra
30 Dec 188961.9ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
1 May 190375.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

MicroData Summary for Henryk Piotr Kossowski:
Bishop Henryk Piotr Kossowski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

  • a priest for 46.1 years
  • a bishop for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,803
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 514

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013