Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Szczepan (Stefano) Sobalkowski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Kielce

Titular Bishop of Medeli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1902BornKromotowo
27 Jul 192421.6Ordained PriestPriest of Kielce, Poland
3 Jun 195754.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kielce, Poland
3 Jun 195754.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Medeli
11 Feb 195855.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Medeli
12 Feb 195855.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Kielce, Poland

MicroData Summary for Szczepan (Stefano) Sobalkowski:
Bishop Szczepan (Stefano) Sobalkowski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Kielce

  • a priest for 33.5 years
  • a bishop for .0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1959
  • b/c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013