Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Cognata, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bova, Italy

Titular Bishop of Pharsalus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1885Born
29 Aug 190923.8Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
16 Mar 193347.4AppointedBishop of Bova, Italy
23 Apr 193347.5Ordained BishopBishop of Bova, Italy
5 Jan 194054.2ResignedBishop of Bova, Italy
6 Aug 196377.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Pharsalus
22 Jul 197286.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Bova, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Cognata
Bishop Giuseppe Cognata S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bova

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAgrigento

  • a priest for 62.8 years
  • a bishop for 39.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: CB
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1933, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast