Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luigi Arrigoni

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio to Peru

Titular Archbishop of Apamea in Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1890Born
18 Jan 192231.6Ordained PriestPriest
31 May 194655.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Peru
31 May 194655.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Apamea in Syria
28 Jul 194656.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Apamea in Syria
6 Jul 194858.0DiedApostolic Nuncio to Peru

MicroData Summary for Luigi Arrigoni
Archbishop Luigi Arrigoni (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio of Peru

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMorimondo, Italy

  • a priest for 26.4 years
  • a bishop for 1.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018