Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Michele Cardinal Lega

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation of the Discipline of the Sacraments

Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1860BornBrisighella
13 Sep 188323.7Ordained PriestPriest of Faenza, Italy
20 Oct 190848.8AppointedDean of the Roman Rota
25 May 191454.4Elevated to Cardinal
25 May 191454.4ResignedDean of the Roman Rota
25 May 191454.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio
15 Dec 191455.0AppointedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura
20 Mar 192060.2AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Discipline of the Sacraments
18 Dec 192465.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eustachio
21 Jun 192666.5AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
11 Jul 192666.5Ordained BishopCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
16 Dec 193576.0DiedPrefect of the Congregation of the Discipline of the Sacraments

MicroData Summary for Michele Lega:
Cardinal Michele Lega (born , died ) Prefect of Discipline of the Sacraments

  • a priest for 52.3 years
  • a bishop for 9.4 years
  • a cardinal for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1926, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013