Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Zhang Runbo (Ciamgioenpuo, Chang Yuin-po)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Xuanhua [Süanhwa], China

Titular Bishop of Cynopolis in Arcadia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1899Born
22 Dec 192223.7Ordained PriestPriest
7 Jul 193637.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Süanhwafu, China
7 Jul 193637.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Tadamata
28 Oct 193637.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tadamata
11 Apr 194647.0AppointedBishop of Xuanhua [Süanhwa], China
20 Nov 194748.6ResignedBishop of Xuanhua [Süanhwa], China
20 Nov 194748.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Cynopolis in Arcadia
23 Aug 194950.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Xuanhua [Süanhwa], China

MicroData Summary for Joseph Zhang Runbo (Ciamgioenpuo, Chang Yuin-po)
Bishop Joseph Zhang Runbo (Ciamgioenpuo, Chang Yuin-po) (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Xuanhua [Süanhwa]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChawangchow
Ordained BishopCollege de la Propaganda, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceHong Kong

  • a priest for 26.6 years
  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,936, Number 76
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Number 241
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 26 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.6, 19 Dec 2019; Data: 26 Jan 2020

Quantcast