Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Battista Guidi

Deceased

Apostolic Delegate to Philippines

Titular Archbishop of Stauropolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Apr 1852BornCollepardo, Italy
1875²22.7Ordained PriestPriest
6 Sep 190250.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Stauropolis
21 Sep 190250.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Stauropolis
25 Sep 190250.4AppointedApostolic Delegate to Philippines
22 Jul 190452.2DiedApostolic Delegate to Philippines

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Guidi:
Archbishop Giovanni Battista Guidi (born , died ) Apostolic Delegate of Philippines

  • a priest for 29.6 years
  • a bishop for 1.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 528
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1902, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013