Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Americo Bevilacqua

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Alatri, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Scythopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1862Born
4 Apr 188522.3Ordained PriestPriest
29 Apr 190946.4AppointedBishop of Alatri, Italy
2 May 190946.4Ordained BishopBishop of Alatri, Italy
22 Jan 191552.1ResignedBishop of Alatri, Italy
22 Jan 191552.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhithymna
2 Feb 191855.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Scythopolis
20 Mar 192663.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Alatri, Italy

MicroData Summary for Americo Bevilacqua
Archbishop Americo Bevilacqua (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Alatri

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoccagorga

  • a priest for 40.9 years
  • a bishop for 16.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 42
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1909, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018