Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Guido Tonetti

Deceased

Bishop of Cuneo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1903Born
13 Aug 192724.4Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jul 195047.3AppointedPrelate of Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy
25 Jul 195047.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Chalcedon
25 Jul 195047.3AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Messina, Italy
24 Sep 195047.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Chalcedon
16 Feb 195753.9AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Cuneo, Italy
3 Jun 197168.2DiedBishop of Cuneo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Guido Tonetti
Archbishop Guido Tonetti (born , died ) Bishop of Cuneo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrecate

  • a priest for 43.8 years
  • a bishop for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 75

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 7 Jun 2017