Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles (Carlo) Maria Cavallera, I.M.C. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Marsabit


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jan 1909BornCentallo, Italy
19 Dec 193122.9Ordained PriestPriest of Consolata Missionaries
19 Jun 194738.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Nyeri, Kenya
19 Jun 194738.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Sufes
15 Aug 194738.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sufes
25 Mar 195344.2AppointedBishop of Nyeri, Kenya
25 Nov 196455.9AppointedBishop of Marsabit, Kenya
19 Jun 198172.4ResignedBishop of Marsabit, Kenya
22 Sep 199081.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Marsabit, Kenya

MicroData Summary for Charles (Carlo) Maria Cavallera:
Bishop Charles (Carlo) Maria Cavallera I.M.C. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Marsabit

  • a priest for 58.8 years
  • a bishop for 43.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 83

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013