Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Artur Michael Landgraf

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Bamberg, Germany

Titular Bishop of Eudocia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1895Born
4 Aug 191823.4Ordained PriestPriest of Bamberg, Germany
17 Oct 194348.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bamberg, Germany
17 Oct 194348.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Eudocia
21 Nov 194348.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eudocia
8 Sep 195863.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Bamberg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Artur Michael Landgraf
Bishop Artur Michael Landgraf (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Bamberg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTraunstein

  • a priest for 40.0 years
  • a bishop for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1943, Number 73

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast