Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Lenhardt

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Bamberg

Titular Bishop of Carystus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1899BornCham
6 Apr 192425.2Ordained PriestPriest of Bamberg, Germany
6 Jun 195960.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bamberg, Germany
6 Jun 195960.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Carystus
25 Jul 195960.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Carystus
21 Apr 196667.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Bamberg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Lenhardt:
Bishop Johann Lenhardt (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Bamberg

  • a priest for 42.0 years
  • a bishop for 6.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 70

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013