Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stefano Russo

Bishop Emeritus of Fabriano-Matelica, Italy

Apostolic Administrator of Fabriano-Matelica

Note/Previous Titular See: (Sect. Gen. of CEI on 28 Sep 2018)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Aug 1961 Born
20 Apr 199129.6Ordained PriestPriest of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
18 Mar 201654.5AppointedBishop of Fabriano-Matelica, Italy
28 May 201654.7Ordained BishopBishop of Fabriano-Matelica, Italy
11 Jun 201654.7InstalledBishop of Fabriano-Matelica, Italy
27 Apr 201957.6ResignedBishop of Fabriano-Matelica, Italy
27 Apr 201957.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Fabriano-Matelica, Italy

MicroData Summary for Stefano Russo (VIAF: 505153653230455900001)
Bishop Stefano Russo (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Fabriano-Matelica

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAscoli Piceno, Diocese of Ascoli Piceno
Ordained BishopSanta Maria Madre de Dio, Cathedral Basilica, Ascoli Piceno, Diocese of Ascoli Piceno

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Fabriano-Matelica.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Mar 2016
  • ob/i: CB, 23 Mar 2016
  • c2+: CB, 15 May 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,926
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 13 Jul 2019

Quantcast