Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Mosciatti

Bishop of Imola, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1958 Born
6 Dec 198628.8Ordained PriestPriest of Fabriano-Matelica, Italy
31 May 201961.3AppointedBishop of Imola, Italy
13 Jul 201961.4Ordained BishopBishop of Imola, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Mosciatti
Bishop Giovanni Mosciatti (born ) Bishop of Imola

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMatelica, Diocese of Fabriano e Matelica
Ordained BishopSt. Cassian, Cathedral, Imola, Diocese of Imola

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Imola.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 May 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast