Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Mauro Maria Cardinal Gambetti, O.F.M. Conv.

President of the Fabric of St. Peter

Cardinal-Deacon of Santissimo Nome di Maria al Foro Traiano

Archpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Oct 1965 Born
19 Sep 199226.8EnteredMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
29 Aug 199529.8Temporary VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
20 Sep 199832.8Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
8 Jan 200034.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
30 Oct 202055.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thisiduo
22 Nov 202055.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Thisiduo
28 Nov 202055.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santissimo Nome di Maria al Foro Traiano
28 Nov 202055.0Elevated to Cardinal
20 Feb 202155.3AppointedPresident of the Fabric of St. Peter
20 Feb 202155.3AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}

MicroData Summary for Mauro Maria Gambetti
Mauro Maria Cardinal Gambetti O.F.M. Conv. (born ) President of Fabric of St. Peter

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastel San Pietro Terme, Archdiocese of Bologna, Italy
Ordained PriestSS. Crocifisso, Convent, Longiano, Diocese of Cesena-Sarsina, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Francesco d’Assisi, Basilica, Assisi, Diocese of Assisi-Nocera Umbra-Gualdo Tadino, Italy

Please contact the Cardinal through the Fabric of St. Peter.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Oct 2020
  • ob/c2+: CB, 5 Nov 2020
  • 3t43: Annuario Pontificio Variazioni, Year 2020, Number 19
  • c34: CB, 17 Nov 2020
  • cpri: Bollettino, 28 Nov 2020
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 246, Number 20,542
  • mn: CB, 11 Feb 2021
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 20 Feb 2021

Quantcast