Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Dominique Joseph Mathieu, O.F.M. Conv.

Archbishop of Teheran-Ispahan, Iran


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1963 Born
23 Sep 198421.2Simple VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
20 Sep 198724.2Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
24 Sep 198926.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
8 Jan 202157.5AppointedArchbishop of Teheran-Ispahan, Iran
16 Feb 202157.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Teheran-Ispahan, Iran

MicroData Summary for Dominique Joseph Mathieu
Archbishop Dominique Joseph Mathieu O.F.M. Conv. (born ) Archbishop of Teheran-Ispahan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArlon, Belgium
Ordained PriestDamme, Belgium
Ordained BishopXII Apostoli, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Teheran-Ispahan.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Jan 2021
  • simp/mn: CB, 8 Jan 2021
  • ob: CB, 22 Jan 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 17 Feb 2021

Quantcast