Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Scuppa

Deceased

Bishop of Fabriano-Matelica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1927BornApiro
4 Mar 195022.9Ordained PriestPriest
31 May 197851.1AppointedBishop of Fabriano e Matelica, Italy
2 Jul 197851.2Ordained BishopBishop of Fabriano e Matelica, Italy
26 Nov 200174.6DiedBishop of Fabriano-Matelica, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Scuppa:
Bishop Luigi Scuppa (born , died ) Bishop of Fabriano-Matelica

  • a priest for 51.7 years
  • a bishop for 23.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013