Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Macario Tinti

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Fabriano e Matelica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Apr 1900BornMontemarciano
24 Feb 192322.8Ordained PriestPriest
17 May 196060.0AppointedBishop of Fabriano e Matelica, Italy
29 Jun 196060.2Ordained BishopBishop of Fabriano e Matelica, Italy
31 May 197878.1RetiredBishop of Fabriano e Matelica, Italy
30 Nov 2000100.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Fabriano e Matelica, Italy

MicroData Summary for Macario Tinti:
Bishop Macario Tinti (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Fabriano e Matelica

  • a priest for 77.8 years
  • a bishop for 40.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 72
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013