Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlo Liberati

Prelate Emeritus of Pompei o Beatissima Vergine Maria del Santissimo Rosario


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1937 BornMatelica
29 Jul 196224.7Ordained PriestPriest
5 Nov 200366.0AppointedPrelate of Pompei o Beatissima Vergine Maria del Santissimo Rosario, Italy
10 Jan 200466.2Ordained BishopPrelate of Pompei o Beatissima Vergine Maria del Santissimo Rosario, Italy
24 Jan 200466.2InstalledPrelate of Pompei o Beatissima Vergine Maria del Santissimo Rosario, Italy
7 Jul 200769.7AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title)
10 Nov 2012³75.0RetiredPrelate of Pompei o Beatissima Vergine Maria del Santissimo Rosario, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo Liberati:
Archbishop Carlo Liberati (born ) Prelate Emeritus of Pompei o Beatissima Vergine Maria del Santissimo Rosario

Please contact the Archbishop through the Territorial Prelature of Pompei o Beatissima Vergine Maria del Santissimo Rosario.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Jul 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Number 14,506
  • r: Bollettino, 10 Nov 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013