Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Antonio Anselmi

Deceased

Bishop of San Severino (Marche)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jun 1747BornViterbo
9 Jun 177023.0Ordained PriestPriest
18 Dec 178639.5AppointedBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
24 Dec 178639.5Ordained BishopBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
26 Mar 179244.8AppointedBishop of San Severino (Marche), Italy
Jan 181668.6DiedBishop of San Severino (Marche), Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelo Antonio Anselmi:
Bishop Angelo Antonio Anselmi (born ) Bishop of San Severino (Marche)

  • a priest for 45.6 years
  • a bishop for 29.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013