Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Calvi-Organi

Deceased

Bishop of San Severino (Marche)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1654³BornPrato
23 Sep 170248.5Ordained PriestPriest
2 Mar 170551.0AppointedBishop of San Severino (Marche), Italy
25 Jul 172167.3DiedBishop of San Severino (Marche), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Calvi-Organi:
Bishop Alessandro Calvi-Organi (born , died ) Bishop of San Severino (Marche)

  • a priest for 18.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 356
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1705, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 17 Jun 2015