Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Scipione Negrelli

Deceased

Bishop of San Severino (Marche), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1642¹Born
20 Jan 166422.0Ordained PriestPriest
13 Sep 167735.6AppointedBishop of San Severino (Marche), Italy
19 Sep 167735.7Ordained BishopBishop of San Severino (Marche), Italy
11 May 170260.3DiedBishop of San Severino (Marche), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Scipione Negrelli
Bishop Scipione Negrelli (born 1642, died ) Bishop of San Severino (Marche)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFerrara

  • a priest for 38.3 years
  • a bishop for 24.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 355
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1677, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018