Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Maldachini, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of San Severino (Marche), Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
15 May 1645AppointedBishop of Aquino, Italy
19 Nov 1646AppointedBishop of San Severino (Marche), Italy
22 Jun 1677DiedBishop of San Severino (Marche), Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelo Maldachini
Bishop Angelo Maldachini O.P. (died ) Bishop of San Severino (Marche)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 314, and Page 91
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1645, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018