Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Enrico Cardinal Caetani

Deceased

Chamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1550Born
29 Jul 158534.9AppointedTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}
11 Aug 158535.0Ordained BishopTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}
18 Dec 158535.3Elevated to Cardinal
15 Jan 158635.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana
26 Oct 158737.2AppointedChamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber
13 Dec 159949.3DiedChamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber

MicroData Summary for Enrico Caetani (VIAF: 49378197)
Enrico Cardinal Caetani (born , died ) Chamberlain (Camerlengo) of Apostolic Chamber

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSermoneta, Italy
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)S. Pudenziana, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 14.3 years
  • a cardinal for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1585
  • ob/c2+: CB, 29 Sep 2011
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 102
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 257

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 8 May 2017