Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Annibale de Capua

Deceased

Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1544¹BornNapoli
1 Jul 157733.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
11 Aug 157834.6AppointedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
12 Oct 157834.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
Nov 1578³34.8ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
15 Nov 158642.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
1591¹47.0ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
2 Sep 159551.6DiedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Annibale de Capua (VIAF: 87644865)
Archbishop Annibale de Capua (born 1544, died ) Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}

  • a bishop for 16.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 255
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,398
  • ob/c2/nunc: CB, 19 Jul 2016
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 18,958
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 258

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 3 Oct 2016