Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Domenico Cardinal Ginnasi

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1551BornCastel Bolognese
17 Dec 158635.4AppointedArchbishop of Manfredonia, Italy
28 Dec 158635.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Manfredonia, Italy
11 Aug 159847.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
24 Mar 160048.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
5 May 160048.8ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
9 Jun 160452.9Elevated to Cardinal
Jun 1605³53.9ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
20 Jun 160554.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio
30 Jan 160654.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli
5 Nov 160756.3ResignedArchbishop of Manfredonia, Italy
16 Sep 162473.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
2 Mar 162674.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
20 Aug 162978.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
15 Jul 163079.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
12 Mar 163987.7DiedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domenico Ginnasi (VIAF: 89006127)
Domenico Cardinal Ginnasi (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

  • a bishop for 52.2 years
  • a cardinal for 34.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Jun 1604
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 301
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 25, Number 116
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 267

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 6 Oct 2016