Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mateo Burgos Moraleja, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Sigüenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1548¹BornValladolid
25 Sep 160052.7AppointedBishop of Pamplona, Spain
1 Jan 160153.0Ordained BishopBishop of Pamplona, Spain
16 Jan 160658.0AppointedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
24 Jan 161163.1DiedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mateo Burgos Moraleja:
Bishop Mateo Burgos Moraleja O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Sigüenza

  • a bishop for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,411
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013