Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Girolamo Costanzo

Deceased

Archbishop of Capua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1587¹BornNapoli
24 Dec 162135.0SelectedBishop of Trivento, Italy
9 Jan 162336.0ConfirmedBishop of Trivento, Italy
15 Jan 162336.0Ordained BishopBishop of Trivento, Italy
1 Mar 162740.2AppointedArchbishop of Capua, Italy
Sep 1633³46.7DiedArchbishop of Capua, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Costanzo:
Archbishop Girolamo Costanzo Archbishop of Capua

  • a bishop for 10.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 345, and Page 133
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 78, Number 465

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013