Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luis Fernández de Córdoba

Deceased

Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Feb 1555³BornCórdoba
20 Nov 160247.8AppointedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
9 Feb 160348.0Ordained BishopBishop of Salamanca, Spain
9 Feb 161560.0AppointedBishop of Málaga, Spain
26 Oct 162267.7AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
11 Mar 162469.1AppointedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
26 Jun 162570.4DiedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luis Fernández de Córdoba:
Archbishop Luis Fernández de Córdoba (died ) Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}

  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 204, and Page 158
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 300, and Page 229
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 118, Number 747

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 17 Nov 2014