Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Bautista Acevedo Muñoz

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Valladolid

Patriarch of West Indies


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1555²BornHoz de Anero
30 Apr 160146.3AppointedBishop of Valladolid, Spain
17 Jun 160146.4Ordained BishopBishop of Valladolid, Spain
16 Jan 160651.0AppointedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain
28 Apr 160651.3ResignedBishop of Valladolid, Spain
8 Jun 160853.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Valladolid, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Bautista Acevedo Muñoz:
Bishop Juan Bautista Acevedo Muñoz (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Valladolid

  • a bishop for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab/ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 124, Number 11,156
  • bp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 116, Number 734
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 209, and Page 357
  • ob/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1601, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 8 Feb 2015