Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Prudencio Sandoval, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Pamplona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1551¹BornValladolid
10 Mar 160857.1AppointedBishop of Tui, Spain
18 May 160857.3Ordained BishopBishop of Tui, Spain
27 Feb 161261.1AppointedBishop of Pamplona, Spain
12 Mar 162069.1DiedBishop of Pamplona, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Prudencio Sandoval:
Bishop Prudencio Sandoval O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Pamplona

  • a bishop for 11.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Number 11,571
  • bp/bd/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 271, and Page 348
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 123, Number 788
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1608, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 8 Feb 2015